EP3514211 - ABRASION-RESISTANT ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Strasse 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Straße 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMBUSCH, René August-Jung-Weg 10 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
LEERMANN, Timo Erbschlöer Straße 77 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 18206552.4 | 15.11.2018 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | DE201820100248U | 17.01.2018 Original published format: DE 202018100248 U | [2019/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514211 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3514211 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/21, B60R16/02, D03D13/00, D03D1/00, D03D15/283 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09J7/385 (KR);
D01F6/60 (EP,KR);
D01F6/62 (EP,KR);
D03D1/00 (EP);
D03D1/0041 (KR,US);
D03D13/008 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D03D23/00 (KR);
D03D3/005 (KR,US);
D06N3/0006 (US);
D06N3/0034 (US);
D06N3/0036 (US);
D06N3/12 (US);
C09J2203/302 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/312 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2477/006 (EP,KR,US);
D06N2201/0263 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/30] | C09J7/21, D03D1/00, D03D13/00, D03D15/00, B60R16/02, H01B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABRIEBFESTES KLEBEBAND | [2019/30] | English: | ABRASION-RESISTANT ADHESIVE TAPE | [2019/30] | French: | RUBAN ABRASIF RÉSISTANT À L'USURE | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 01.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08144149 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1,9,10,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] *; | [X]EP2157147 (TESA SE [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100]; examples 1-3 * * figure 3 * * claims 1-6, 8, 9 *; | [X]US2010227102 (KEENER PHILLIP R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * figure 1 ** claims 1, 4, 5, 8, 10 *; | [XI]EP2298845 (TESA SE [DE]) [X] 1,9,10,13-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * page 7 - page 8; tables 2, 3 * * claims 1, 3-7, 9, 12, 15 * [I] 3-8,11; | [XI]DE202017103893U (GEBR AURICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] * * figure 1 * * claims 1, 3, 7 * [I] 7 | Examination | US2010313989 | US2012132309 | EP2520629 |