EP3653719 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING BIOMASS DEGRADATION PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGF Nature Energy Biogas A/S Ørbækvej 260 5220 Odense SØ / DK | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEPPESEN, Martin Dan Ejlstrupvej 40 5200 Odense V / DK | 02 /
GYLLENBORG, Morten Enzo Abildgårdsvej 8 5700 Svendborg / DK | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 18206733.0 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653719 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12P5/02 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
C12P2201/00 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOMASSENABBAUPRODUKTEN | [2020/21] | English: | A METHOD OF PRODUCING BIOMASS DEGRADATION PRODUCTS | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS DE DÉGRADATION DE BIOMASSE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4982027 (KORFF JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 6, line 29 - line 38 * * col. 8, l. 61-col. 7, l. 10; page 8, line 3 - line 8 * * page 8, line 61 - page 9, line 10 *; | [A]WO2011080766 (KIRLOSKAR INTEGRATED TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 2 * * page 11, line 4 - line 6 *; | [A]WO2018083301 (INBICON AS [DK]) [A] 1-28 * page 8, paragraph 6 * * page 24, paragraph 3 - page 25, paragraph 1 * * page 28, line 5 - line 16 *; | [A] - C.H. CHOI ET AL, "Two-step acid hydrolysis process kinetics in the saccharification of low-grade biomass: 1. Experimental studies on the formation and degradation of sugars", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19961101), vol. 58, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0960-8524(96)00089-2, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 101 - 106, XP055585214 [A] 1-28 * page 105, column 1, line 1 - page 106, column 1, line 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(96)00089-2 |