EP3489206 - BUILDING MATERIAL MIXTURE FOR USE AS AN ELECTRICAL HEATING MATERIAL MIXTURE AND HEATING ELEMENT WITH SUCH A BUILDING MATERIAL MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZKS Effektiv Heizung GmbH Fünfhausener Landweg 130 21079 Hamburg / DE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zinke, Bernhard Siedlerstr. 5 03044 Cottbus / DE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Werner-Eckert-Str. 4 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/22] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18206776.9 | 16.11.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | DE20171011019 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017011019 | [2019/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489206 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489206 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B28/021 (EP);
H05B3/145 (EP);
C04B2111/00465 (EP);
C04B2111/92 (EP);
F24D13/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/021, C04B14/022, C04B14/06, C04B14/386, C04B20/008 (EP);
C04B28/021, C04B14/024, C04B14/06, C04B14/386, C04B20/008 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/024, C04B14/06, C04B14/386, C04B18/08, C04B20/008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | C04B28/02, F24D13/02, H05B3/14, C04B111/92 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BAUSTOFFGEMISCH ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ELEKTRISCHES HEIZUNGSWERKSTOFFGEMISCH SOWIE HEIZKÖRPER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN BAUSTOFFGEMISCH | [2019/22] | English: | BUILDING MATERIAL MIXTURE FOR USE AS AN ELECTRICAL HEATING MATERIAL MIXTURE AND HEATING ELEMENT WITH SUCH A BUILDING MATERIAL MIXTURE | [2019/22] | French: | MÉLANGE DE MATÉRIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION DESTINÉ À L'UTILISATION EN TANT QUE MÉLANGE DE MATÉRIAUX DE CHAUFFAGE ÉLECTRIQUE AINSI QUE RADIATEUR DOTÉ D'UN TEL MÉLANGE DE MATÉRIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 27.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2018 | AL | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | IT | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | TR | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | IE | 16.11.2022 | LU | 16.11.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 16.11.2018 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 16.11.2018 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.11.2018 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0040519 ; | [X]US3626149 (CARNEY PETER R, et al) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * example 2 *; | [A]US4301356 (TANEI TADAYOSHI, et al) [A] 1,9,10 * claims 1,2 *; | CN1344235 [ ] (POWERCO S P A [IT]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [X]DE10324822 (DIENSTLEISTUNGSGRUPPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2010130353 (ZIMMERER WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,10* claims 1-16 *; | [A]DE202010012457U (GROPPENWEIS HANS DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0002] * * claim 1 *; | [X]DE102011007834 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0087] *; | [X]DE102012000767 (LUPO CLEAN BESCHICHTUNGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * abstract * * page 3; examples 1,3 *; | [X]EP2712853 (DANTONIT AS [DK]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0001] * * claims 1-13 *; | [X]WO2015076841 (SUPERIOR GRAPHITE CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] * * claims 1-12 * * figure 1; table 1 *; | [X] - WU T ET AL, "A study on electrical and thermal properties of conductive concrete", COMPUTERS & CONCRETE : AN INTERNATIONAL JOU, TECHNO-PRESS, TAEJON, KOREA, (20130101), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.12989/CAC.2013.12.3.337, ISSN 1598-8198, pages 337 - 349, XP008170651 [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract * * paragraph [03.1] * * example SG20; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.12989/cac.2013.12.3.337 | [X] - MIODUSHEVSKY P. V.; REVEVSKAYA G. A.; RAPIAH L. N., "Composite electroconducting material for electrothermal element comprises colloidal graphite electroconducting component, antiplastic filler, and quick cement binder", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 40, Database accession no. 2000-465930, XP002790121 & WO0040519 A1 20000713 (POWERCO SPA) [X] 1,3-6,9,10 * abstract * | Examination | WO2005085152 | CA2573739 | - ERIC STURM, "Elektrisch erzeugte Waerme verhindert Schnee und Eisglaette", INTERNET CITATION, (20160601), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://www.beton.org/aktuell/news/details/beheizbarer-beton-fuer-strassen-und-bruecken/, (20171101), XP009517687 |