EP3653675 - COATED ARTICLE AND METHOD FOR COATING OF AN ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innologic BVBA Jolainstraat 44 8554 Sint Denijs / BE | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMETSCHEK, Marc Anton Charles Zandvoordeplaats 65 8980 Zandvoorde / BE | 02 /
LAPERRE, Michael Eckhard Rosanne Gullegemsestraat 131 8880 Sint Eloois Winkel / BE | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18206969.0 | 19.11.2018 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653675 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09D7/65 (US);
B29C48/022 (US);
B29C48/05 (US);
B29C48/154 (US);
B44C5/06 (US);
C09D201/00 (US);
C09D7/69 (US);
B29K2301/12 (US);
B29K2675/00 (US);
B29K2715/003 (US);
B29K2995/0072 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES ARTIKELS | [2020/21] | English: | COATED ARTICLE AND METHOD FOR COATING OF AN ARTICLE | [2020/21] | French: | ARTICLE REVÊTU ET PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT D'UN ARTICLE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5869166 (CALDWELL KENNETH G [US]) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 55 - page 2, line 8 * * abstract *; | [X]WO9915595 (BURLINGTON BIO MED & SCIENT [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 25 ** abstract *; | [X]EP1323787 (ARMSTRONG WORLD IND INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024] * * abstract *; | [X]EP1942174 (RURY FINANCE INC [PA]) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * abstract *; | [X]US2011281978 (DESAI UMESH C [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * abstract *; | [X]EP2871169 (DAW SE [DE]) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * abstract * | by applicant | EP2301763 | EP2402142 | EP2682277 | - S.P. SILVA et al., "Cork: properties, capabilities and application", International Materials Reviews, (20050000), vol. 50, no. 6, page 347,348 |