EP3489147 - ASSEMBLY FOR AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A MOUNTING STRUT PRIMARY STRUCTURE ATTACHED TO A WING BOX BY FASTENERS PARTIALLY EMBEDDED IN THE PRIMARY STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations SAS 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUTIS, Olivier 5, lotissement des Tournesols Chemin du Factou 31330 MERVILLE / FR | 02 /
BOUCHET, Eric 14 Lotissement les Genêts 31840 AUSSONNE / FR | 03 /
BARBARA, Olivier 6 bis, rue René Cassin 81700 PUYLAURENS / FR | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18207255.3 | 20.11.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | FR20170061113 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1761113 | [2019/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489147 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/26, B64D27/18, B64D27/12 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B64D27/12 (EP,US);
B64D27/40 (US);
B64D27/18 (EP,US);
B64D27/402 (EP,US);
B64D27/404 (EP,US);
B64D27/406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEIT FÜR LUFTFAHRZEUG, DIE EINE PRIMÄRSTRUKTUR EINER AUFHÄNGESÄULE UMFASST, DIE AN EINEM FAHRWERKSKASTEN MITHILFE VON TEILWEISE IN DER PRIMÄRSTRUKTUR VERANKERTEN ANSCHLÜSSEN BEFESTIGT IST | [2019/22] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A MOUNTING STRUT PRIMARY STRUCTURE ATTACHED TO A WING BOX BY FASTENERS PARTIALLY EMBEDDED IN THE PRIMARY STRUCTURE | [2019/22] | French: | ENSEMBLE POUR AERONEF COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE PRIMAIRE DE MAT D'ACCROCHAGE FIXEE A UN CAISSON DE VOILURE PAR DES ATTACHES PARTIELLEMENT ENTERREES DANS LA STRUCTURE PRIMAIRE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 25.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4560122 (PARKINSON COLIN C A [GB], et al); | [AD]FR2887522 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]); | [A]FR2915178 (AIRBUS FRANCE SA [FR]); | [IY]FR2958266 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]); | [YA]US2015013142 (WEST RANDALL RAY [US]) |