EP3469918 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMORPHOUS PROTEIN EXTRUDATES AND AMORPHOUS PROTEIN EXTRUDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solae, LLC 4300 Duncan Avenue St. Louis, MO 63110 / US | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLORIO, Santiago c/o Solae, LLC 4300 Duncan Avenue St. Louis, Missouri 63110 / US | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | International N&H EMEA Parallelvej 16 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | DuPont EMEA Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 18207285.0 | 20.07.2010 | [2019/16] | Priority number, date | US200922691109P | 20.07.2009 Original published format: US 22691109 P | US200926511809P | 30.11.2009 Original published format: US 26511809 P | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3469918 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/14, A23J3/04, A23J3/16, A23J3/26, A23L7/126, A23L7/17, A23L13/40, A23L13/60, A23P30/20, A23L7/117 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A23J3/26 (EP,KR,US);
A23J3/16 (EP,KR,US);
A23J3/04 (KR);
A23J3/08 (KR);
A23J3/14 (KR);
A23L13/426 (EP,KR,US);
A23L13/67 (EP,KR,US);
A23L7/117 (EP,KR,US);
A23L7/126 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/1578 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMORPHEM PROTEINEXTRUDATE UND AMORPHE PROTEINEXTRUDAT | [2019/16] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMORPHOUS PROTEIN EXTRUDATES AND AMORPHOUS PROTEIN EXTRUDATES | [2019/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'EXTRUDAT DE PROTÉINE AMORPHE ET EXTRUDAT DE PROTÉINE AMORPHE | [2019/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10802806.9 / EP2456322 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4418086 (MARINO RICHARD P [US], et al) [Y] 1-13* column 8, line 57 - line 68 *; | [IY]US2008102165 (NING LUPING L [US], et al) [I] 14,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * [Y] 1-13 | by applicant | US3117006 | US4118164 | US4763569 | - ADLER-NISSEN, J. Agric. Food Chem., (19790000), vol. 27, no. 6, page 1256 |