EP3505342 - MULTILAYER STRUCTURE FOR FORMING A FLOOR COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GERFLOR 50, Cours de la République 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMANT, Nicolas Rue du Comtat Venaissin 84600 VALRÉAS / FR | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/27] | 01 /
DUMANT, Nicolas Rue du Comtat Venaissin 84600 VALREAS / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras CS 70 203 15 rue Camille de Rochetaillée 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/27] | Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18207408.8 | 20.11.2018 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | FR20170063346 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1763346 | [2019/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505342 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3505342 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B5/26, B32B5/18, B32B5/24, B32B5/32, B32B27/08, B32B27/30, B32B37/00 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B37/02 (EP);
B32B5/028 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
B32B5/32 (EP);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/0207 (EP);
B32B2262/0223 (EP);
B32B2262/0238 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/0284 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2266/0235 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (EP);
B32B2307/4023 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE STRUKTUR FÜR DIE AUSFÜHRUNG EINES BODENBELAGS | [2019/27] | English: | MULTILAYER STRUCTURE FOR FORMING A FLOOR COVERING | [2019/27] | French: | STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE POUR LA RÉALISATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT DE SOL | [2022/52] |
Former [2019/27] | STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE POUR LA REALISATION D'UN REVETEMENT DE SOL | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 14.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23151553.7 / EP4183570 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4698258 (HARKINS JR JOSEPH C [US]) [A] 1-11* figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0210504 (GERFLOR SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 3, line 6 - line 29 * * examples 1-3 * * claim - *; | [A]EP1961553 (GERFLOR [FR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0008] , [0013] , [0022]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP2481848 (IVC NV [BE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0034] - [0048] * * figure -; claim - *; | [XAI]EP3095927 (GERFLOR [FR]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0030] - [0037] - [0045]; figure -; claim - * [A] 10,11 [I] 4-8; | [A]FR3048379 (GERFLOR [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 19 - line 26 * * page 15, line 9 - line 19 * * page 18, line 15 - line 26 * * figure -; claim - * |