EP3489859 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku 141-8562 Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sadowara, Tetsuya c/o IP Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 141-8562 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Hiromasa c/o IP Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 141-8562 / JP | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 18208528.2 | 27.11.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | JP20170226572 | 27.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017226572 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489859 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489859 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/22 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G06V10/225 (EP,US);
G06F18/241 (US);
G06V10/235 (EP,US);
G06V30/413 (US);
G06V30/414 (US);
H04N1/6094 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | G06K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/22] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2019/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 22.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2023 | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | IT | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | PL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SE | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
IT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5619592 (BLOOMBERG DAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007253620 (NAGARAJAN RAMESH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,12,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] * [I] 13,14; | [A]US8494280 (NAGARAJAN RAMESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - RICARDO DA SILVA BARBOZA ET AL, "Using Readers' Highlighting on Monochromatic Documents for Automatic Text Transcription and Summarization", 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, (20110930), doi:10.1109/ICDAR.2011.51, ISBN 978-1-4577-1350-7, pages 212 - 216, XP055574178 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.2011.51 |