EP3473260 - ACELLULAR TISSUE MATRIX COMPOSITIONS FOR TISSUE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeCell Corporation 5 Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWENS, Rick T 1127 Monroe Drive Stewartsville New Jersey, 08886 / US | 02 /
SUN, Wendell 2308 Birch Court Warrington Pennsylvania / US | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 18208957.3 | 09.07.2008 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | US200794879307P | 10.07.2007 Original published format: US 94879307 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473260 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473260 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/00, A61L27/36, A61L27/16, A61L27/18, C08L89/06 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A61L27/362 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/36 (EP,US);
A61L27/3633 (EP,US);
A61L31/005 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C08L89/06 (EP,US);
A61L2400/18 (US);
A61L2420/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L23/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/17] | A61K35/36, A61K9/19, C08L89/06, A61L31/00, A61L27/36, A61L27/16, A61L27/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AZELLULÄRE GEWEBEMATRIXZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR GEWEBEREPARATUR | [2019/17] | English: | ACELLULAR TISSUE MATRIX COMPOSITIONS FOR TISSUE REPAIR | [2019/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE MATRICE TISSULAIRE ACELLULAIRE POUR LA RÉPARATION TISSULAIRE | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 24.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08772486.0 / EP2162142 | EP15197130.6 / EP3011962 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2008 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | TR | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 09.07.2008 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
TR | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.07.2008 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002091445 (SUNG HSING-WEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 41 - page 4, paragraph 42 ** claim - *; | [A]US2003225355 (BUTLER CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 45 - page 6, paragraph 47 * * page 8, paragraphs 72-73 * * claim - *; | [I]US2005013872 (FREYMAN TOBY [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 4, paragraphs 33-34 * * page 5, paragraph 51 * * page 6, paragraphs 59-61 * * page 8, paragraph 75 - page 9, paragraph 88 * * page 11, paragraphs 112-116 *; | [A]US2006153815 (SEYDA AGNIESZKA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 37 - page 5, paragraph 50 * * page 6, paragraph 58 - page 7, paragraph 60 * * claim - *; | [A]US2007088434 (FRANK ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 55 * | by applicant | US4619257 | US4676070 | US4799361 | US4865871 | US4964280 | US5024838 | US5044165 | US5154007 | US5336616 | US5364756 | US5366616 | US5780295 | US6166288 | US6194136 | US2003035843 | US2005028228 | US6933326 | - CAMPBELL et al., Nature, (19960000), vol. 380, pages 64 - 66 | - FRANKS, Proc. Inst. Refrigeration, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 32 - 39 |