EP3489783 - SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTED FLIGHT MANAGEMENT CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACDOWELL, Connor HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
HAMMER, Todd HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
MOHAN, Rajeev HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 04 /
SARKAR, Partho HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 05 /
UDUPA, Ravish HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 06 /
SNYDER, Richard HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Corner House 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 18208972.2 | 28.11.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | IN201741042706 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: IN201741042706 | US201815978832 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US201815978832 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489783 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G01C23/00, G08G5/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G05D1/0077 (EP);
G05D1/104 (EP);
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERTEILTEN FLUGVERWALTUNGSKAPAZITÄT | [2019/22] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTED FLIGHT MANAGEMENT CAPABILITY | [2019/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAPACITÉ DE GESTION DE VOL DISTRIBUÉE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 11.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2021 | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/37] | 09.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 15.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016240088 (MCGUFFIN THOMAS F [US]) [Y] 2* Paragraphs [0016], [0019]. *; | [XYI]US9824593 (KRONFELD KEVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8 * Column 3 lines 10-16, 27-67; column 4 lines 1-4, 23-30, 36-38, 43-48, 55-59; column 8 lines 39-43; Figure 1A. * [Y] 2 [I] 7 |