EP3659574 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ZIRCON OXIDE BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jiang, Bo Meisenweg 6 9470 Werdenberg / CH | 02 /
Ritzberger, Christian Spitalstrasse 60 9472 Grabs / CH | 03 /
Rothbrust, Frank Dorfstrasse 25 6822 Röns / AT | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 18209272.6 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659574 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/02, A61C13/00 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61C13/0022 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/488 (CN);
A61C13/0006 (US);
A61C13/083 (KR);
A61C13/20 (KR);
A61K6/807 (EP);
A61K6/818 (EP,US);
A61K6/822 (EP);
B28B1/26 (US);
C04B35/48 (KR);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP);
C04B35/6263 (EP,CN);
C04B35/62635 (EP);
C04B35/6264 (EP);
C04B35/62685 (EP);
C04B35/632 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C04B35/64 (CN,US);
C04B38/00 (EP);
C04B2111/00836 (KR);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3246 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/549 (EP);
C04B2235/6027 (EP,US);
C04B2235/606 (US);
C04B2235/608 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/6565 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/6581 (EP);
C04B2235/6585 (EP);
C04B2235/6586 (EP);
C04B2235/661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP);
C04B2235/95 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (EP);
C04B2235/9615 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/9653 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/9661 (EP,CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L29/04 (EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (EP);
C04B38/00, C04B35/48, C04B38/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZIRKONOXID-ROHLINGS | [2020/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ZIRCON OXIDE BLANK | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN LINGOT D'OXYDE DE ZIRCONIUM | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008148494 (NOBEL BIOCARE SERVICES AG [CH], et al) [X] 18,20,21,24 * claims 1-12 * * page 5, line 4 - line 5 * [I] 19,22,23; | [AD]WO2013181018 (GLIDEWELL JAMES R DENTAL CERAMICS INC [US], et al) [AD] 18-24* claims 1-20 *; | [AD]WO2014209626 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT INC [US]) [AD] 1-17 * claims 1-65 *; | [XI]EP3108849 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 18,20,21 * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0046] * [I] 19,22-24; | [X]CN107696235 (ZHONGSHAN HUATONGDA CERAMICS TECH CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2018049331 (JENSEN IND INC [US]) [AD] 1-17 * claims 1-17 * | by applicant | EP0826642 | WO2009061410 | WO2013181018 | KR101416654B | WO2014209626 | WO2018049331 |