EP3486255 - PROTEIN IN WHICH ELECTRICAL INTERACTION IS INTRODUCED WITHIN HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTION SITE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibentrus Inc. 401ho 1646 Yuseong-daero Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-811 / KR | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hoeon 528-1001 35 Naejeong-ro 165beon-gil Bundang-gu 463-922 Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Creek, Isobel Clare, et al The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Icely, Dominic Michael The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18209348.4 | 13.03.2014 | [2019/21] | Priority number, date | US201361780390P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361780390 P | [2019/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3486255 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3486255 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/10, C07K16/28, C07K16/46, C07K19/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (US);
C07K16/1018 (EP,US);
C07K16/241 (US);
C07K16/244 (US);
C07K16/247 (US);
C07K16/26 (US);
C07K16/2863 (US);
C07K16/2866 (US);
C07K16/2875 (EP,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/515 (EP,US);
C07K2317/522 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C07K2319/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | PROTEIN AN EINER HYDROPHOBEN ELEKTRISCHEN INTERAKTIONSSTELLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/21] | English: | PROTEIN IN WHICH ELECTRICAL INTERACTION IS INTRODUCED WITHIN HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTION SITE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/21] | French: | PROTÉINE DANS LAQUELLE L'INTERACTION ÉLECTRIQUE EST INTRODUITE À L'INTÉRIEUR DU SITE D'INTERACTION HYDROPHOBE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14764140.1 / EP2975061 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009089004 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 13, lines 16-18; tables 4,6,7 *; | [YA]WO2011028952 (XENCOR INC [US], et al) [Y] 1 * table 2 * [A] 2-7; | [IY] - K. GUNASEKARAN ET AL, "Enhancing Antibody Fc Heterodimer Formation through Electrostatic Steering Effects: APPLICATIONS TO BISPECIFIC MOLECULES AND MONOVALENT IgG", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20100416), vol. 285, no. 25, doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.117382, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 19637 - 19646, XP055303838 [I] 1-7 * figure 1b; tables 1, S1 * [Y] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.117382 | [A] - MARIA AIKO ANGELA A. DIAZ, "Effects of engineering charged amino acids in the CH3 domains on antibody heavy chain dimerization", PHILIPPINE SCIENCE LETTERS, (20110101), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 48 - 55, XP055158328 [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * | [A] - CARTER PAUL ED - SANCHEZ ANA ET AL, "Bispecific human IgG by design", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010101), vol. 248, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00339-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 7 - 15, XP002974199 [A] 1-7 * figure 2d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00339-2 |