Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
06.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.06.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.01.2020 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.12.2019 | Change - classification | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
20.12.2019 | Change - classification | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
20.12.2019 | Change - French title | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
11.10.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
11.10.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
11.10.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
09.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
31.07.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.03.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
21.12.2018 | Change - representative | |
05.12.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.12.2018 | Change - representative |