EP3492882 - LIQUID LEVEL DETECTION SENSOR AND SPECIMEN TESTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/23] | SPECIMEN TESTING APPARATUS AND LIQUID LEVEL DETECTION SENSOR | ||
[2022/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, Nishiochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8560 / JP | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Koji c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation, 1-6, Kusunokidai 1-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
TANAZAWA, Masahiro c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation, 1-6, Kusunokidai 1-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
SAEKI, Kazunari c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation, 1-6, Kusunokidai 1-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP | [2022/33] |
Former [2019/23] | 01 /
MASUDA, Koji c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation, 1-6 Kusunokidai 1-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
TANAZAWA, Masahiro c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation, 1-6 Kusunokidai 1-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
SAEKI, Kazunari c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation, 1-6 Kusunokidai 1-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 18209733.7 | 03.12.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | JP20170232385 | 04.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017232385 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492882 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3492882 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/292 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
G01F23/2921 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSSTANDDETEKTIONSSENSOR UND PROBENTESTVORRICHTUNG | [2022/30] | English: | LIQUID LEVEL DETECTION SENSOR AND SPECIMEN TESTING APPARATUS | [2022/30] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DÉTECTION DE NIVEAU DE LIQUIDE ET APPAREIL DE TEST D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2022/30] |
Former [2019/23] | PROBENTESTVORRICHTUNG UND FLÜSSIGKEITSSTANDDETEKTIONSSENSOR | ||
Former [2019/23] | SPECIMEN TESTING APPARATUS AND LIQUID LEVEL DETECTION SENSOR | ||
Former [2019/23] | APPAREIL DE TEST D'ÉCHANTILLON ET CAPTEUR DE DÉTECTION DE NIVEAU DE LIQUIDE | Examination procedure | 02.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 02.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | LU | 03.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9623208 (NARTRON CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,9-11,15 * figures 1,8,9 * * page 21, line 21 - line 25 * * page 12, line 10 - line 14 * [I] 5-8,12-14; | [A]JP2006010597 (WADA TAKASHI) [A] 5 * figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]US2012242993 (SCHICK KARL G [US], et al) [A] 6-8,12-14* paragraph [0060] * | Examination | JPH08304149 | JP2007086036 | JP2017532535 | by applicant | JP3741509B |