|
14.01.2025 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2025 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2025 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2025 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2024 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2024 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
04.10.2024 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2024 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2024 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2024 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2024 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2023 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 16 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 17 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
42 |
|
24.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2023 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2023 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.11.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2019 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |