EP3570276 - DIALOGUE SYSTEM, AND DIALOGUE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Motor Company 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | [2021/31] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states Hyundai Motor Company 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | ||
For all designated states Kia Motors Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Dongsoo C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SEOK, Donghee C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
JOO, Sihyun C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jeong-Eom C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
KIM, Ga Hee C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
KIM, Seona C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
PARK, Jung Mi C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
RO, Heejin C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 09 /
KIM, Kye Yoon C/O Intellectual Property Team 1, Hyundai Motor Company, 150, Hyundaiyeonguso-ro, Namyang-eup Hwaseong-si 18280 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/40] |
Former [2019/47] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18209865.7 | 03.12.2018 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | KR20180056497 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180056497 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570276 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3570276 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/18, G10L15/30, G10L15/22, G10L15/24 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G10L15/18 (EP);
G10L15/22 (CN,KR,US);
B60R16/023 (KR);
B60R16/0234 (CN);
G10L15/04 (KR);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G10L15/26 (CN,KR);
G10L15/30 (EP);
H04L67/12 (CN);
H04W4/40 (CN);
H04W4/48 (KR);
G10L15/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DIALOGSYSTEM UND DIALOGVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/47] | English: | DIALOGUE SYSTEM, AND DIALOGUE PROCESSING METHOD | [2019/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIALOGUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DIALOGUE | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 06.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2273491 (VOICEBOX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]US2014136187 (WOLVERTON MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [I]WO2014204655 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [A]WO2015179510 (AMAZON TECH INC [US]) |