EP3663150 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A RESPONSE TIME PARAMETER OF A BRAKE CHAMBER OF A BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE AND BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bencsik, Gergely Cserhát 9 1078 Budapest / HU | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18210064.4 | 04.12.2018 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663150 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3663150 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
B60T17/22 (EP);
B60T17/226 (EP);
B60T2270/14 (EP);
B60T2270/406 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES REAKTIONSZEITPARAMETERS EINES BREMSZYLINDERS EINES BREMSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BREMSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND BREMSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A RESPONSE TIME PARAMETER OF A BRAKE CHAMBER OF A BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE AND BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UN PARAMÈTRE DE TEMPS DE RÉPONSE D'UNE CHAMBRE DE FREIN D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2020/24] |
Former [2020/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES REAKTIONSZEITPARAMETERS EINES BRENNZYLINDERS EINES BREMSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BREMSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND BREMSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | Examination procedure | 23.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2023 | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | PL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0733531 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 6, line 21 - line 39 * * column 7, line 47 - line 58 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 4 * * column 11, line 40 - line 53 * * column 13, line 1 - line 52 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 5,6; | [Y]US5788337 (ECKERT ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 34 - line 37 * * claim 8 ** figures 1,3,4 * |