EP3663723 - ENCODER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWLEY, Colin Keith Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | 02 /
MCADAM, Simon Eliot Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Rolfe, Edward William, et al Patent Department Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18210257.4 | 04.12.2018 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663723 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14, G01D5/244 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G01D5/24471 (EP);
G01D5/2451 (GB);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01D5/2457 (GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CODIERERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/24] | English: | ENCODER APPARATUS | [2020/24] | French: | APPAREIL CODEUR | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19536661 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 1, lines 26-47 * * column 4, lines 11-29 * * claim 1 *; | [ID]EP0826138 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [ID] 1-14 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2018216972 (SLACK JASON [GB], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 3-5 * | by applicant | GB1504691 | WO8603833 | WO8707944 | US5621319 | EP0826138 | WO0163215 | WO2005124282 | WO2015049173 | WO2017042570 | WO2017203210 |