Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024014916 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | JP2018235030 | 17.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10767123 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2019194557 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190076901 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019143120 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109957422 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3028188 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3502214 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102018076254 | 20.12.2022 | B1 | BR102018076254 | 15.10.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3075941 | 26.02.2021 | B1 | FR3075941 | 28.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2763007 | 24.12.2021 | C2 | RU2018145511 | 17.11.2021 | A3 | RU2018145511 | 22.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201936913 | 16.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1762992 | 22.12.2017 |