EP3502214 - COIL HEAT EXCHANGER FOR HYDROTREATMENT OR HYDROCONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXENS 89 Bd. Franklin Roosevelt B.P. 50802 92508 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILLEVIC, Marion 84 BOULEVARD GALLIENI 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | 02 /
GOBERT, Virginie 7 ALLEE DE LA PAGERIE 92500 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | 03 /
FRECON, Jacinthe 39, rue Crevel Duval 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 04 /
LAJEUNESSE, Odile 3 rue de la Mare 92500 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18210579.1 | 05.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | FR20170062992 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762992 | [2019/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502214 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/00, C10G47/00, C10G49/00, F28D7/02, F28D9/04 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C10G65/12 (EP,US);
C10G45/26 (BR,KR);
C10G65/02 (BR,KR);
B01J8/06 (RU);
C10G45/00 (EP,US);
C10G47/00 (EP,RU,US);
C10G47/32 (BR,KR);
C10G49/00 (EP,US);
C10G67/02 (CN);
F28D21/00 (CN);
F28D7/02 (BR,RU);
F28D7/024 (US);
F28D9/04 (RU);
C10G11/18 (EP,US);
C10G21/14 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1033 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1037 (KR);
C10G2300/107 (EP,CN,US);
C10G2300/1077 (EP,CN,US);
C10G2300/202 (CN);
C10G2300/205 (CN);
C10G2300/4006 (KR);
C10G2400/04 (CN);
C10G55/06 (EP,US);
F25J1/0022 (US);
F25J1/0052 (US);
F25J2220/64 (US);
F28D2021/0059 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERSPULE FÜR DIE HYDROBEHANDLUNG ODER HYDROUMWANDLUNG | [2019/26] | English: | COIL HEAT EXCHANGER FOR HYDROTREATMENT OR HYDROCONVERSION | [2019/26] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR BOBINÉ POUR HYDROTRAITEMENT OU HYDROCONVERSION | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 02.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB348690 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG); | [X]GB360530 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO); | [X]GB377938 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO); | [X]US1949632 (RUSSELL ROBERT P); | [XI]WO2011002429 (UTC POWER CORP [US], et al); | [A]EP3184607 (AXENS [FR]) |