Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3495246 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2020 | B1 | EP3495246 | 12.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1751511 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3495314 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP3495314 | 12.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1751511 | 08.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE542067 | 18.02.2020 | C2 | SE1751511 | 09.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1751511 | 08.12.2017 |