EP3543850 - CLOUD SYSTEM DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Cloud Computing Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Cloud Data Center Jiaoxinggong Road Qianzhong Avenue Gui'an New District Guizhou 550025 / CN | [2022/12] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Sihai Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129, P.R. / CN | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/08] |
Former [2019/39] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 18211347.2 | 25.10.2014 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | CN201310511740 | 25.10.2013 Original published format: CN201310511740 | [2019/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543850 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543850 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3543850 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45562 (US);
G06F2009/45579 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR CLOUD-SYSTEM | [2019/39] | English: | CLOUD SYSTEM DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DONNÉES DE SYSTÈME CLOUD | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 27.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14855743.2 / EP3048529 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2014 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | ES | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | MT | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | TR | 23.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | LU | 25.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.10.2014 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
TR | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 25.10.2014 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 25.10.2014 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.10.2014 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 25.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008046610 (TRIPATHI SUNAY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3; claims 1-20 *; | [I]US2012311566 (TAKAOKA NOBUMITSU [JP], et al) [I] 1,3-6,8-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0116] * * figures 1-15; claims 1-32 *; | [I] - KONSTANTINOU A V ET AL, "An architecture for virtual solution composition and deployment in infrastructure clouds", INTERNET CITATION, ISBN 978-1-60558-580-2, (20090615), pages 9 - 17, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/1560000/1555339/p9-konstantinou.pdf?key1=1555339&key2=0580489821&coll=DL&dl=ACM&CFID=111005859&CFTOKEN=66777387, (20101115), XP002610018 [I] 1,3-6,8-11 * abstract * * page 9, column r, paragraph 1. - page 12, column r, paragraph 4.; figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1560000/1555339/p9 |