EP3525368 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM OF DETERMINING A SET OF ZERO CORRELATION ZONE LENGTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/39] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mauritz, Oskar Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2022/39] |
Former [2019/33] | 01 /
Mauritz, Oskar Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd., Intellectual Property Department G1-2F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/33] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18211467.8 | 22.04.2008 | [2019/33] | Priority number, date | CN20071074200 | 30.04.2007 Original published format: CN200710074200 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525368 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3525368 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/00 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
H04J13/0055 (EP,BR,US);
H04W28/065 (BR,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,BR,US);
H04J13/14 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2019/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES SATZES VON NULLKORRELATIONSZONENLÄNGEN | [2019/33] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM OF DETERMINING A SET OF ZERO CORRELATION ZONE LENGTHS | [2019/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UN ENSEMBLE DE LONGUEURS DE ZONE DE CORRÉLATION NULLE | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08734126.9 / EP2120379 | EP13188630.1 / EP2698939 | Divisional application(s) | EP22174235.6 / EP4064591 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | GB | 22.04.2023 | IE | 22.04.2023 | LU | 22.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/12] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
GB | 22.04.2023 | ||
LU | 22.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
GB | 22.04.2023 | ||
LU | 22.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
GB | 22.04.2023 | ||
LU | 22.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 22.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 |