Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
11.04.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.04.2021 | First examination report | |
25.12.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.12.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.12.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
20.12.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
27.05.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
12.12.2018 | Change - representative |