Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10823068 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | B2 | US2019186362 | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017223433 | 20.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3502439 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017223433 | 20.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017223433 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017223433 | 20.12.2017 |