EP3486477 - VERTICAL AXIS WIND TURBINE SYSTEM WITH ONE OR MORE INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC POWER GENERATION UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vert Nova, LLC 326 Lincoln Avenue Verona PA 15905-5710 / US | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARANOVICH, Jorge 326 Lincoln Avenue Verona, PA 15905-5710 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Frank W 325 Graystone Lane Johnstown, PA 15905-5710 / US | 03 /
GAYARRE VILLORIA, Jose Jorge Salvador Dali 57-1-3 08810 Barcelona / ES | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18211621.0 | 05.09.2014 | [2019/21] | Priority number, date | US201361874561P | 06.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361874561 P | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486477 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/02, F03D7/06, F03D13/20, F03D80/50 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
F03D3/04 (EP,US);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D15/05 (US);
F03D15/10 (EP,US);
F03D15/20 (EP,US);
F03D3/005 (EP,US);
F03D3/02 (EP,US);
F03D3/062 (US);
F03D80/50 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
H02K13/003 (US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F05B2220/7066 (EP,US);
F05B2220/7068 (EP,US);
Y02E10/728 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENSYSTEM MIT VERTIKALER ACHSE MIT EINER ODER MEHREREN UNABHÄNGIGEN STROMERZEUGUNGSEINHEITEN | [2019/21] | English: | VERTICAL AXIS WIND TURBINE SYSTEM WITH ONE OR MORE INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC POWER GENERATION UNITS | [2019/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉOLIENNE À AXE VERTICAL AVEC UNE OU PLUSIEURS UNITÉS DE PRODUCTION D 'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE INDÉPENDANTES | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/21] | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14842683.6 / EP3042074 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010253084 (LIN JUNG-KUEI [TW], et al) [Y] 1,4,6-10,12* paragraph [0050]; figures 8,9 *; | [YA]WO2011104506 (UNIV CITY [GB], et al) [Y] 1,4,6-10,12 * figures 6,6a,7 * * page 21, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 13, line 2 - page 14, paragraph 2 * [A] 2,3,5,11,13 |