EP3667531 - A COMPUTING DEVICE WITH INCREASED RESISTANCE AGAINST ADDRESS PROBING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Stichting VU De Boelelaan 1105 1081 HV Amsterdam / NL | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhat, Koustubha c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bos, Hendrik Jaap c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Giuffrida, Cristiano c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Van der Kouwe, Erik c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18211711.9 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667531 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/54 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G06F21/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECHNERVORRICHTUNG MIT ERHÖHTER WIDERSTANDSFÄHIGKEIT GEGEN ADRESSENABTASTUNG | [2020/25] | English: | A COMPUTING DEVICE WITH INCREASED RESISTANCE AGAINST ADDRESS PROBING | [2020/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE ACCRUE CONTRE LE SONDAGE D'ADRESSES | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9754112 (MORITZ CSABA ANDRAS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,12,15-19 * abstract * * column 4, line 28 - line 45 * * column 6, line 30 - line 60 * * column 7, line 10 - line 51 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 28 * * column 12, line 19 - column 14, line 27 * * claim 10 * * figures 1, 2, 6 * [I] 6,10,13,14; | [A]US2016092674 (HUGHES GREGORY D [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017091447 (BOEHM OMER Y [IL], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017213039 (WERNER JAN JAKUB [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018046585 (OKHRAVI HAMED [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | - Proftpd CVE 2006-5815, (20060000), URL: https://www.exploit-db.com/exploits/2856/ | - BROP Nginx exploit., (20140000), URL: http://www.scs.stanford.edu/brop | - perf: Add infrastructure and support for Intel PT, (20140000), URL: https://lwn.net/Articles/ 609010/. | - Intel Processor Trace decoder library, (20150000), URL: https://github.com/01org/processor-trace | - Poking Holes, (20160000), URL: https://github.com/vusec/poking-holes | - ApacheBench, (20180000), URL: http://httpd.apache.org/docs/2.4/programs/ab.html | - libdwarf' library, (20180000), URL: https://www.prevanders.net/dwarf.html. | - MARTIN ABADI; MIHAI BUDIU; ULFAR ERLINGSSON; JAY LIGATTI, "Control-flow integrity principles, implementations, and applications", ACM Transactions on Information and System Security (TISSEC, (20090000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1145/1609956.1609960, page 1, XP058137877 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1609956.1609960 | - "Readactor: Practical code randomization resilient to memory disclosure", STEPHEN CRANE; CHRISTOPHER LIEBCHEN; ANDREI HOMESCU; LUCAS DAVI; PER LARSEN; AHMAD-REZA SADEGHI; STEFAN BRUNTHALER; MICHAEL FRANZ, In Security and Privacy (SP), 2015 IEEE Symposium on, IEEE, (20150000), pages 763 - 780 | - "The performance cost of shadow stacks and stack canaries", THURSTON HY DANG; PETROS MANIATIS; DAVID WAGNER, Proceedings of the 10th ACM Symposium on Information, Computer and Communications Security, ACM, (20150000), pages 555 - 566 | - "Data-oriented programming: On the expressiveness of non-control data attacks. In Security and Privacy (SP", HONG HU; SHWETA SHINDE; SENDROIU ADRIAN; ZHENG LEONG CHUA; PRATEEK SAXENA; ZHENKAI LIANG, 2016 IEEE Symposium on, IEEE, (20160000), pages 969 - 986 | - Intel. Processor Tracing, URL: https://software.intel.com/en-us/blogs/2013/09/18/processor-tracing | - "No Need to Hide: Protecting Safe Regions on Commodity Hardware", KOEN KONING; XI CHEN; HERBERT BOS; CRISTIANO GIUFFRIDA; ELIAS ATHANASOPOU- LOS, Proceedings of the Twelfth European Conference on Computer Systems, ACM, (20170000), pages 437 - 452 | - "Just-in-time code reuse: On the effectiveness of fine-grained address space layout randomization. In Security and Privacy (SP", KEVIN Z SNOW; FABIAN MONROSE; LUCAS DAVI; ALEXANDRA DMITRIENKO; CHRISTOPHER LIEBCHEN; AHMAD-REZA SADEGHI, 2013 IEEE Symposium on, IEEE, (20130000), pages 574 - 588 | - "Heisenbyte: Thwarting memory disclosure attacks using destructive code reads", ADRIAN TANG; SIMHA SETHUMADHAVAN; SALVATORE STOLFO, Proceedings of the 22nd ACM SIGSAC Conference on Computer and Communications Security, ACM, (20150000), pages 256 - 267 |