EP3484052 - CURRENT SOURCE CALIBRATION TRACKING TEMPERATURE AND BIAS CURRENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Analog Way Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Haiyang 231 High Street Winchester, Massachusetts 01887-3462 / US | 02 /
YANG, Wenhua 400 Sharpners Pond Road Wilmington, Massachusetts 01845 / US | 03 /
EGAN, Nathan Apt 1104, 100 Woodview Way Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | [2019/27] |
Former [2019/20] | 01 /
ZHU, Haiyang 5 Lee Street Wilmington, Massachusetts 01887 / US | ||
02 /
YANG, Wenhua 400 Sharpners Pond Road Wilmington, Massachusetts 01845 / US | |||
03 /
EGAN, Nathan 1 Sorelle Place Burlington, Massachusetts 01803 / US | Representative(s) | Horler, Philip John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/36] |
Former [2019/20] | Horler, Philip John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18211740.8 | 21.01.2015 | [2019/20] | Priority number, date | US201414169986 | 31.01.2014 Original published format: US201414169986 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484052 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3484052 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10, G05F3/02, // H03M1/74 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G05F3/02 (EP,US);
H03F1/30 (EP);
H03F3/45183 (EP);
H03M1/1009 (US);
H03M1/1019 (EP,US);
H03M1/742 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMQUELLENKALIBRIERUNG MIT VERFOLGUNG VON TEMPERATUR UND VORSPANNUNGSSTROM | [2019/20] | English: | CURRENT SOURCE CALIBRATION TRACKING TEMPERATURE AND BIAS CURRENT | [2019/20] | French: | ÉTALONNAGE DE SOURCE DE COURANT PERMETTANT LE SUIVI DE VARIATION DE TEMPÉRATURE ET DE COURANT DE POLARISATION | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 12.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2023 | 07.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15151969.1 / EP2911301 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0561099 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]); | [A]EP0766385 (HARRIS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0818884 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2006176106 (LEE JEONG-WON [KR]); | Examination | EP0561099 | EP0766385 | EP0818884 | US2005073290 |