EP3498365 - STIRRER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKATO Rühr- und Mischtechnik GmbH Hohe-Flum-Strasse 37 79650 Schopfheim / DE | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Nienhaus, Bernd Joseph-Haydn-Straße 30 79664 Wehr / DE | 02 /
Stangier, Daniel Hornrain 1 79639 Grenzach-Whylen / DE | 03 /
Dr. Grebe, Thorsten Rudolfstraße 20 4054 Basel / CH | 04 /
Dr. Last, Wolfgang Danzingerstr. 42 79539 Lörrach / DE | 05 /
Rohn, Nicole Schwalbenstraße 15a 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 18211834.9 | 12.12.2018 | [2019/25] | Priority number, date | DE201710129836 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017129836 | [2019/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498365 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3498365 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01F27/072, B01F27/1123, B01F27/96 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B01F27/0727 (EP,US);
B01F27/192 (CN,US);
B01F27/0723 (US);
B01F27/0724 (EP,US);
B01F27/1123 (EP,US);
B01F27/1125 (US);
B01F27/113 (US);
B01F27/80 (CN);
B01F27/90 (CN);
B01F27/96 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | B01F7/32, B01F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÜHRORGANVORRICHTUNG | [2019/25] | English: | STIRRER DEVICE | [2019/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF FORMANT ORGANE D'AGITATION | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | LU | 12.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SI | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CH406149 (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,8,11,14-18 * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5-7,10,12,13 [I] 9; | [XAI]JPH10265226 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,12,14,17,18 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * [A] 3,10,11,13,15,16 [I] 7,9; | [XAI]DE20307458U (EKATO RUEHR MISCHTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,11,14,17,18 * abstract * [A] 3-7,10,12,13,15,16 [I] 9; | [XAI]WO2007052955 (SAMSUNG FINE CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 2,8,11,14-18 * figures 3,4 * * abstract * [A] 1,3-7,10,12,13 [I] 9; | [XAI]FR2893517 (DESVOYS ET FILS SOC PAR ACTION [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,10,11,14-18 * figures 1,3 * * abstract * [A] 5-7,12,13 [I] 9; | [XAI]DE202006007423U (EKATO RUEHR MISCHTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8,11,14,17,18 * figures 1-3 * * abstract * [A] 4,5,10,12,13,15,16[I] 7,9; | [XAI]JP2008012452 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-5,8,12,14-18 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * [A] 6,7,10,11,13 [I] 9; | [XAI]US2011261643 (HANDA HARUHISA [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,12-14,17,18 * figures 1-6 * * abstract * [A] 3,6,7,11,15,16 [I] 9; | [XAI]EP3031519 (SUMITOMO HEAVY IND PROCESS EQUIPMENT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,8,11,14,17,18 * figures 1,6,8-11 * * abstract * [A] 2,3,10,12,13,15,16 [I] 7,9 |