EP3531114 - VISUAL INSPECTION DEVICE AND ILLUMINATION CONDITION SETTING METHOD OF VISUAL INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2022/19] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Shingo c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2022/38] |
Former [2019/35] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Shingo c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi KYOTO, 600-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18211912.3 | 12.12.2018 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | JP20180031111 | 23.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018031111 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531114 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3531114 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/8806 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/74 (US);
G01N21/88 (CN);
G06T7/0004 (US);
H04N23/71 (US);
G01N2021/8809 (CN,KR);
G01N2021/8835 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2021/8845 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2201/062 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VISUELLEN INSPEKTION UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER BELEUCHTUNGSBEDINGUNG EINER VISUELLEN INSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/35] | English: | VISUAL INSPECTION DEVICE AND ILLUMINATION CONDITION SETTING METHOD OF VISUAL INSPECTION DEVICE | [2019/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION VISUELLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DES CONDITIONS D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION VISUELLE | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 30.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2018 | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | BG | 21.09.2022 | CY | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | IT | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | MK | 21.09.2022 | MT | 21.09.2022 | NL | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | TR | 21.09.2022 | IE | 12.12.2022 | LU | 12.12.2022 | GB | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.12.2022 | GR | 22.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | FR | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 12.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
BG | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
TR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 12.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
TR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 12.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 12.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 12.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.12.2018 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
GB | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2005007593 (LEBENS GARY A [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * paragraphs [0032] , [0052]; figures 2,3,5 * [A] 3,10 [Y] 6 [I] 5; | [YA]EP1710566 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 6 * figure 2 *[A] 3,10 | by applicant | JP2018017638 |