EP3531284 - PROCESS CONTROL DEVICE, MANUFACTURING DEVICE, PROCESS CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Hiromi c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Kenichiro c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Hiroshi c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto, 600-8530 / JP | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18212139.2 | 13.12.2018 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | JP20180032052 | 26.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018032052 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531284 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/52, G05B19/418 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
G06F9/524 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (EP,US);
G05B19/41815 (US);
G05B2219/32239 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32252 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32258 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROZESSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROZESSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2019/35] | English: | PROCESS CONTROL DEVICE, MANUFACTURING DEVICE, PROCESS CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2019/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS, DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 17.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4791554 (HIROTA ATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * column 1, line 7 - line 25 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 20 - line 48 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 8 * * claim 1 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Deadlock - Wikipedia", (20180207), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Deadlock&oldid=824418348, (20190529), XP055592832 [A] 1-7 * page 2, section "Necessary conditions" * | by applicant | JP2005527893 |