EP3656831 - COMPOSITION AND FLOORING PRODUCT COMPRISING SUCH COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aladdin Manufacturing Corporation 160 South Industrial Boulevard Calhoun, GA 30701 / US | [2024/42] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Aladdin Manufactuing Corporation 160 South Industrial Boulevard Calhoun, GA 30701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHATIA, RAJEEV 6586 Orange Plank Drive Hixson, TN Tennessee 37343 / US | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Unilin Technologies Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [2024/42] |
Former [2020/22] | Van Steenlandt, Wim August Maria Mohawk International Services, BVBA Patent department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 18212374.5 | 13.12.2018 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | US201862771277P | 26.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862771277 P | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656831 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3656831 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/04, C08L75/04, C09J127/06 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C09J175/04 (EP);
C09J5/06 (US);
A47G27/02 (US);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C09J127/06 (EP,US);
C09J175/06 (US);
E04F15/105 (US);
C09J2427/00 (US);
C09J2475/00 (US);
E04F2201/043 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08L27/06 (EP);
C09J127/06, C08L75/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/22] | C09J175/04, C08L75/04, C09J127/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BODENPRODUKT MIT EINER SOLCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/22] | English: | COMPOSITION AND FLOORING PRODUCT COMPRISING SUCH COMPOSITION | [2020/22] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PRODUIT DE SOL COMPRENANT UNE TELLE COMPOSITION | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 26.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3882191 (BALATONI JULIUS A, et al); | [X]EP0326704 (NORTON CO [US]); | [X]CN105670179 (JIANGSU DEWEI ADVANCED MAT CO LTD); | [X]CN105799134 (CHANGZHOU ZHONGPU CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]CN105860909 (SHENZHEN YONGJIA GRINDING MAT CO LTD); | [X]CN106589563 (GUANGDONG CHENGSONG WATERPROOF TECH DEV CO LTD); | [X]CN108641661 (UNIV CENTRAL CHINA NORMAL) |