EP3489835 - ADDRESS VALIDATION USING SIGNATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEREBRIN, Benjamin C. c/o Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 18212413.1 | 13.05.2016 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | US201562164288P | 20.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562164288 P | US201514867250 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: US201514867250 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489835 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489835 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14, G06F12/1081, G06F21/79 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G06F12/1081 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G06F12/1475 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04L63/0876 (CN,US);
G06F12/1408 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G06F21/79 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04L63/062 (US);
H04L63/164 (US);
H04L9/3236 (CN);
H04L9/3247 (CN,US);
G06F2212/1052 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | G06F12/14, G06F12/10, G06F21/79 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ADRESSENVALIDIERUNG MITTELS SIGNATUREN | [2019/22] | English: | ADDRESS VALIDATION USING SIGNATURES | [2019/22] | French: | VALIDATION D'ADRESSES À L'AIDE DE SIGNATURES | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 28.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16724257.7 / EP3298498 | Divisional application(s) | EP20184432.1 / EP3739458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006253708 (BARDOUILLET MICHEL [FR], et al); | [A]JP2009122858 (KONAMI DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT); | [A]US2010082927 (RIOU SEBASTIEN [KR]) |