EP3502826 - CIRCUIT FOR SEARCHING FOR A MAXIMUM POWER POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGOGNE, Dominique Lieu dit Chazelle 43140 SAINT DIDIER EN VELAY / FR | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18212471.9 | 13.12.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | FR20170062712 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762712 | [2019/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502826 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/67 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G05F1/67 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUCHSCHALTUNG DES MAXIMALEN LEISTUNGSPUNKTS | [2019/26] | English: | CIRCUIT FOR SEARCHING FOR A MAXIMUM POWER POINT | [2019/26] | French: | CIRCUIT DE RECHERCHE DU POINT DE PUISSANCE MAXIMUM | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2280329 (MITSUBISHI ELEC R&D CT EUROPE [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10-12 * abstract * [I] 4-7,9,14; | [A]WO2012090242 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A] - ALI NASR ALLAH ALI ET AL, "A survey of maximum PPT techniques of PV systems", ENERGYTECH, 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120529), doi:10.1109/ENERGYTECH.2012.6304652, ISBN 978-1-4673-1836-5, pages 1 - 17, XP032237332 [A] 4,14 * page 2 - page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EnergyTech.2012.6304652 | [A] - MAHMOUD ET AL, "Transient analysis of a PV power generator charging a capacitor for measurement of the I-V characteristics", RENEWABLE ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 31, no. 13, ISSN 0960-1481, (20061001), pages 2198 - 2206, (20061001), XP027965028 [A] 1-14 * abstract * |