EP3505945 - METHOD AND MEASURING DEVICE FOR CHECKING A CABLE HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESPI Logistics GmbH Kellerstr. 15 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lochmann, Rüdiger Kellerstr. 15 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Kanzlei Dr. Negendanck Patentmanufaktur Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rennweg 60-62 90489 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Negendanck, Matthias Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Univ. Matthias Negendanck Patentmanufaktur Rennweg 60-62 90489 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18212564.1 | 05.09.2017 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | DE201610116695 | 07.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016116695 | [2019/27] | Previously filed application, date | WO2017EP72162 | 05.09.2017 | [2019/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505945 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3505945 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/58, G01R15/16 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G01R31/58 (EP,RU);
G01R31/08 (RU);
G01R15/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | G01R31/02, G01R15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MESSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN EINES KABELBAUMES | [2019/27] | English: | METHOD AND MEASURING DEVICE FOR CHECKING A CABLE HARNESS | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DESTINÉS À VÉRIFIER UN FAISCEAU DE CÂBLES | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 20.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17771352.6 / EP3374776 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 05.09.2023 | GB | 07.09.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 05.09.2023 | ||
GB | 07.09.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT357634B (OESTERR STUDIEN ATOMENERGIE); | [I]US5570010 (JIN DONGZHI [JP], et al); | [A]FR2928740 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) |