Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11965759 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | B2 | US2022026251 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019NL50838 | 16.12.2019 | EP18212682 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3894801 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019NL50838 | 16.12.2019 | EP18212682 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020122728 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18212682 | 14.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3667256 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18212682 | 14.12.2018 |