EP3670099 - HANDHELD POWER TOOL AND SIDE HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstr. 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shadavakhsh, Ali Allacherstr. 311 80999 München / DE | 02 /
Wahle, Quirin Landgerichtsweg 4 86860 Jengen / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18212983.3 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670099 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B25F5/026 (EP,US);
B25D17/04 (EP,US);
B25D2250/051 (EP,US);
B25D2250/121 (EP,US);
B25D2250/361 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTES ELEKTROWERKZEUG UND SEITLICHER HANDGRIFF | [2020/26] | English: | HANDHELD POWER TOOL AND SIDE HANDLE | [2020/26] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE PORTABLE ET POIGNÉE LATÉRALE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/26] | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 20.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 20.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018236629 (GONZALEZ MANUEL [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0064] , [0065]; figures 13,16,17,18 *; | [A]US2014013558 (BEACHY ROBERT WISLER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0117] , [ 134] , [0146] , [0147]; figures 25,26,47,62, 63 *; | [A]US2015107865 (CHEN CUIHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030]; figures 5,6 *; | [AD]US2005200087 (VASUDEVA KAILASH C [CA], et al) [AD] 1-12 * figure 7 *; | [A]US2006067801 (VAN BERGEN JONATHAN R [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0043]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE102013213284 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0048] , [0049]; figure 6a * | by applicant | US9242363 | DE102014102904 | GB2165480 | US8813868 | EP2292385 | US2005217440 | US2012160531 | US2005200087 |