EP3672007 - DETERMINATION OF THE FLOW SPEED IN A COOLANT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Ingolf Karl-Bröger-Str. 33 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Geyer, Horst Oppelner Straße 6 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Chahid, Abderrahim Apostelstr. 25 91334 Hemhofen / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18213067.4 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672007 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02H5/04, H02H7/12, H02M1/32 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H02H5/04 (EP);
H05K7/20927 (US);
G01F1/69 (US);
H05K7/20945 (US);
H02H7/12 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERMITTLUNG DER FLIESSGESCHWINDIGKEIT IN EINEM KÜHLMITTELKREISLAUF | [2020/26] | English: | DETERMINATION OF THE FLOW SPEED IN A COOLANT CIRCUIT | [2020/26] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE LA VITESSE D'ÉCOULEMENT DANS UN CIRCUIT DE RÉFRIGÉRANT | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH05227648 (KOFU NIPPON DENKI KK) [I] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10225099 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1* paragraphs [0009] - [0013]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2004158428 (BYRD DOUGLAS S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,9,10; | [I]CN102045903 (BEIJING HUAJIN CHUANGWEI ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [I] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006018771 |