Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3484134 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3484134



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1100
27.01.2023 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.04.2022 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
24.02.2022 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2022 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2022 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
15.02.2022 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
27.10.2021 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.10.2021 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.10.2021 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.10.2021 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 151
27.10.2021 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 151
15.09.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.09.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.09.2021 Claims Search / examination 3
15.09.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.09.2021 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
19.05.2021 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.05.2021 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.05.2021 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.05.2021 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 151
19.05.2021 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 151
12.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.11.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
12.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2020 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.09.2020 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
07.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.09.2020 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.05.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.05.2020 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.05.2020 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.11.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
14.11.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
14.11.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.07.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
20.05.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.04.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
12.04.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
12.04.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
17.12.2018 Description Search / examination 117
17.12.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Drawings Search / examination 51
17.12.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
30.08.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 199