EP3489895 - INDUSTRIAL VEHICLES WITH POINT FIX BASED LOCALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crown Equipment Corporation 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Mark c/o Crown Equipment Limited 18 Andromeda Crescent East Tamaki 2140 Auckland / NZ | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 18213228.2 | 29.09.2015 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | US201414499700 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: US201414499700 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489895 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489895 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, B66F9/06, G05D1/02, G06T7/13 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B66F9/063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/73 (CN);
B66F9/0755 (KR,US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0094 (US);
G05D1/0246 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/20061 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T2207/30172 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T2207/30252 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INDUSTRIELLE FAHRZEUGE MIT POINT FIX-LOKALISIERUNG | [2019/22] | English: | INDUSTRIAL VEHICLES WITH POINT FIX BASED LOCALIZATION | [2019/22] | French: | VÉHICULES INDUSTRIELS À LOCALISATION BASÉE SUR DES POINTS FIXES | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15791794.9 / EP3201874 | Divisional application(s) | EP20185098.9 / EP3751515 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2015 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | IE | 29.09.2020 | LU | 29.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.09.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.09.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6459955 (BARTSCH ERIC RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-15 * abstract * * column 11, line 10 - line 45 * * column 11, line 61 - line 64 * * column 13, line 6 - line 15 * * column 18, line 39 - line 46 * * figures 8a,10a,11f *; | [A]KR20110033741 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013032192 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10-15 * the whole document *; | US2014235267 [ ] (SONG JAE-BOK [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] * * figure 19 *; | [AP]WO2015048717 (CROWN EQUIPMENT LTD [NZ], et al) [AP] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y] - S Y Cui ET AL, "BUILDING DETECTION AND RECOGNITION FROM HIGH RESOLUTION REMOTELY SENSED IMAGERY", (20080711), URL: http://www.isprs.org/proceedings/XXXVII/congress/3b_pdf/79.pdf, (20141211), XP055158075 [Y] 4 * abstract * * page 414 * * figure 5a * * page 413 * |