Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3483807 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3483807



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 700
06.10.2020 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.06.2020 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
22.01.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 18
22.01.2020 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.01.2020 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.11.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.05.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.04.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 8
21.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
21.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
18.12.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
18.12.2018 Description Search / examination 57
18.12.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.12.2018 Drawings Search / examination 29
18.12.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 98
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 102
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 100
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 96
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 98