Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3508369 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2022 | B1 | EP3508369 | 10.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1850033 | 04.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3076259 | 09.04.2021 | B1 | FR3076259 | 05.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1850033 | 04.01.2018 |