EP3530310 - GUIDE WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMBARA, Kayo c/o TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 150 Maimaigi-cho, Shizuoka Fujinomiya-shi, 418-0015 / JP | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18213842.0 | 19.12.2018 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | JP20180032453 | 26.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018032453 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530310 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3530310 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M25/09016 (CN);
A61M2025/09091 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09133 (US);
A61M2025/09141 (CN);
A61M2025/0915 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHT | [2019/35] | English: | GUIDE WIRE | [2019/35] | French: | GUIDE-FIL | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 10.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4080706 (HEILMAN MARLIN S, et al) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 9 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-5f * [Y] 6; | [XY]US4955384 (TAYLOR CHARLES S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 7 - column 5, line 12; figures 1-12 * [Y] 4,6; | [X]US2003105415 (MIRIGIAN GREGORY E [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 45; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2004082881 (GREWE DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 32; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1938859 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 5 - column 21, line 17; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2012191012 (CHIN ALBERT K [US], et al) [A] 1-6* page 1, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 39; figures 1A-5B * | by applicant | JP2012205793 | JP2015066163 |