EP3669863 - MICRO- OR NANO EMULSIONS INCLUDING ANTICANCER DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capnopharm GmbH Vor dem Kreuzberg 17 72070 Tübingen / DE | [2022/51] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states CAPNOMED GmbH Albring 81 78658 Zimmern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sahoo, Ranjita Am Voßtor 9 47574 Goch / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18213995.6 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669863 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K9/00, A61K47/14, A61K31/282, A61K31/337, A61K31/704 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/107 (US);
A61K31/12 (US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRO- ODER NANOEMULSIONEN MIT ANTIKREBSMITTELN | [2020/26] | English: | MICRO- OR NANO EMULSIONS INCLUDING ANTICANCER DRUGS | [2020/26] | French: | MICRO OU NANO ÉMULSIONS COMPRENANT DES MÉDICAMENTS ANTICANCÉREUX | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN104706585 (TIANJIN MEDRECOM BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LTD); | by applicant | US9511197 |