EP3670048 - MILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Otto-Weg 21 88481 Balzheim / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALCHER, Rainer CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG c/o CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Otto-Weg 21 88481 Balzheim / DE | 02 /
WALCHER, Jochen CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG c/o CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Otto-Weg 21 88481 Balzheim / DE | 03 /
WALCHER, Matthias CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG c/o CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Otto-Weg 21 88481 Balzheim / DE | 04 /
RAPP, Oliver CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG c/o CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Otto-Weg 21 88481 Balzheim / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Ciesla, Dirk, et al Plansee Group Service GmbH IP Department Metallwerk-Plansee-Strasse 71 6600 Reutte / AT | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18215354.4 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670048 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP);
B23C2210/40 (EP);
B23C2210/405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRÄSWERKZEUG | [2020/26] | English: | MILLING TOOL | [2020/26] | French: | OUTIL DE FRAISAGE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU631271 (FEDOTOV GENNADIJ M [SU], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US6742968 (VOLOKH VLADIMIR [IL]) [A] 6-9 * column 4; figure 3 *; | [XAI]US2014119844 (OSAWA JIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0058] * [A] 6-9 [I] 12; | [X]EP2929966 (FRAISA SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,10,11* paragraph [0062] *; | [X]US2017028482 (BOULAKHOV SERGEI VLADIMIR [IL], et al) [X] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | AT14275U |