Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.01.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
04.01.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2022 | First examination report | |
27.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.12.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.12.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.12.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
18.12.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.05.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
22.12.2018 | Change - representative |