EP3669990 - MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Sweden AB Box 132 231 22 Trelleborg / SE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VanZyl, Ian 9 Kensei Road Baldivis, Western Australia 6171 / AU | 02 /
NICHOLLS, Carl 5 Banken Court Forrestdale, Western Australia 6112 / AU | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 665 831 27 Östersund / SE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18215473.2 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669990 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3669990 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B02C25/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B02C25/00 (EP,US);
B02C1/005 (US);
G05D16/2026 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/26] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM | [2020/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | LU | 21.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
IT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2614665 (ERRTA SARL [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,17 * page 1, lines 4-22; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 16 - page 10, line 5 *; | [Y]US2009256015 (TORRES MAURICIO [SE], et al) [Y] 2,4,5,7,13,16* paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0041] - [0048] - [0081] - [0086]; figures 1,3,6 *; | [XY]US2017274383 (RUST JOE [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-17 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0037] - [0042] - [0049] , [0055] , [0056]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,4,5,7,13,16 |