EP3670216 - PASSENGER TRAILER FOR AN ELECTRIC BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrosserie Hess AG Bielstrasse 7 4512 Bellach / CH | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naef, Alex Schmiedestrasse 7 4512 Bellach / CH | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | Application number, filing date | 18215516.8 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670216 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/48, B60D1/62, B62D47/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B60D1/481 (EP);
B60D1/62 (EP);
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60L1/02 (EP);
B60L1/14 (EP);
B60L15/38 (EP);
B60L5/00 (EP);
B60L50/53 (EP);
B60L53/80 (EP);
B62D47/006 (EP);
B62D47/02 (EP);
B60L2200/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSONENANHÄNGER FÜR EINEN ELEKTROBUS | [2020/26] | English: | PASSENGER TRAILER FOR AN ELECTRIC BUS | [2020/26] | French: | REMORQUE POUR PERSONNES POUR UN BUS ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN102205859 (MICROVAST POWER SYSTEMS HUZHOU CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * sentences 24-30,57 * * figures 1,2,3,4 *; | [XI]WO2018115663 (NEWTL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 3, line 15 - line 29 * * page 4, line 12 - line 20 * * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 27 * * figure 1 * [I] 4,12; | [Y]WO2018162030 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 7 - line 9 * * page 6, line 9 - line 25 * * page 8, line 5 - line 26 * * page 11, line 13 - line 28 ** figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102012016234 |