Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11241381 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B2 | US2019192426 | 27.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201711427891 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108066745 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201711427891 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3505156 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2020 | B1 | EP3505156 | 03.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201711427891 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3505156T | 01.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201711427891 | 26.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2861651T | 06.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201711427891 | 26.12.2017 |