EP3647730 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING SAFE NAVIGATION OF AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wipro Limited Doddakannelli Sarjapur Road Bangalore 560 035 Karnataka / IN | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAL, Shyam Sundar Flat No: 14, Block: L/J Kustia Govt. Housing Estate Picnic Garden Road 700039 Kolkata / IN | 02 /
DAS, Gopinath Meghadambaru, Garden Road Kuruda Balasore 756056 Orissa / IN | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18248044.2 | 27.12.2018 | [2020/19] | Priority number, date | IN201841041806 | 05.11.2018 Original published format: IN201841041806 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3647730 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3647730 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G05D1/00, G08G1/01 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
G01C21/3461 (EP);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G01C21/3415 (US);
G01C21/3492 (EP,US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
G08G1/0116 (EP,US);
G08G1/0141 (US);
G08G1/096725 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER SICHEREN NAVIGATION EINES AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGS | [2020/19] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING SAFE NAVIGATION OF AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER LA NAVIGATION SÉCURISÉE D' UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2023/16] |
Former [2020/19] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER LA NAVIGATION SÉCURISÉE DE VÉHICULE AUTONOME | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 06.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3045867 (VOLVO CAR CORP [SE]) [A] 9* paragraphs [0062] , [0063] *; | [A]US2017200371 (GLANDER KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [A] 6,10,11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0025] , [0026] , [0036] , [0037] *; | [XI]US2017234689 (GIBSON TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [X] 1,5,12,13 * paragraphs [0026] , [0045] , [0052] , [0069] , [0060] , [0070] , [0083] - [0084] - [0095] , [0098] , [0107] , [0115] * [I] 2-4,6-11; | [A]EP3342670 (BAIDU USA LLC [US]) [A] 2,3,8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0024] - [0027] - [0036] * |